WA HJM4005 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Affirming Washington's commitment to the Blueprint for an AI Bill of Rights.
Title
Affirming Washington's commitment to the Blueprint for an AI Bill of Rights.
Sponsors
Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Melanie Morgan [D] | Rep. Clyde Shavers [D] |
Rep. Amy Walen [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-26 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2024-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-26 | House | CPB - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |