WA HCR4407 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying the status of bills, memorials, and resolutions for the 2013 first special session of the Sixty-third legislature.
Title
Specifying the status of bills, memorials, and resolutions for the 2013 first special session of the Sixty-third legislature.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Sullivan [D] | Rep. Joel Kretz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-05-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Third reading, adopted. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2013-05-13 | House | Third reading, adopted. |
2013-05-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-05-13 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2013-05-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |