WA HCR4402 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming the Natural Resources Building as the Jennifer Belcher Building.
Title
Renaming the Natural Resources Building as the Jennifer Belcher Building.
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Sen. Jessica Bateman [D] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-15 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-15 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2023-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-27 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |