WA HB3105 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing the director of financial management to include alternative fuel vehicles in a strategy to reduce fuel consumption and emissions from state agency fleets.
Title
Allowing the director of financial management to include alternative fuel vehicles in a strategy to reduce fuel consumption and emissions from state agency fleets.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-22 | Chapter 159, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-22 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-08 | Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-08 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-05 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | EWE - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-26 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment and Water & Energy at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment and Water & Energy at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-12 | First reading, referred to Environment, Water & Energy. | |
2010-02-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on third reading. | |
2010-02-10 | Committee recommendations adopted and the 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-09 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-29 | EPAR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-29 | EPAR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-29 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ecology & Parks at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-26 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ecology & Parks at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-25 | First reading, referred to Ecology & Parks. |