WA HB3048 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning administration of the medicaid program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning administration of the medicaid program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-12 By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2010-03-17 First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2010-03-17 Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:30 PM.
2010-03-16 Third reading, passed; yeas, 75; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 5.
2010-03-15 Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading.
2010-03-15 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2010-03-11 By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2010-02-17 First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care.
2010-02-15 Third reading, passed; yeas, 79; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2010-02-15 Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2010-02-15 Floor amendment
2010-02-15 1st substitute bill substituted
2010-02-13 Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2010-02-09 Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2010-02-08 Minority; do not pass.
2010-02-08 WAYS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2010-02-08 WAYS - Executive action taken by committee.
2010-02-08 Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2010-02-01 Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2010-01-21 First reading, referred to Ways & Means.

Same As/Similar To

SB6710 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback