WA HB3036 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a public meeting before a school district contracts for nonvoter-approved debt.
Title
Requiring a public meeting before a school district contracts for nonvoter-approved debt.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-29 | Chapter 241, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-29 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-23 | EDU - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-22 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-12 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. | |
2010-02-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on third reading. | |
2010-02-10 | Committee recommendations adopted and the 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-09 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-02 | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-02 | ED - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-02 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-29 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-21 | First reading, referred to Education. |