WA HB2995 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning Washington's clean, affordable, and reliable energy future.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning Washington's clean, affordable, and reliable energy future.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-28HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-27HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-27HouseCommittee relieved of further consideration.
2018-02-26HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2018-02-26HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-26HouseFIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2018-02-24HousePublic hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2018-02-21HouseFirst reading, referred to Finance

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback