WA HB2935 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective date 7/1/2010*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective date 7/1/2010*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding environmental and land use hearings boards and making more uniform the timelines for filing appeals with those boards.
Title
Regarding environmental and land use hearings boards and making more uniform the timelines for filing appeals with those boards.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Rep. Bill Hinkle [R] | Rep. Lynn Kessler [D] |
Rep. Michael Sells [D] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] | Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective date 7/1/2010*. | |
2010-03-25 | Chapter 210, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-25 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-11 | President signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-09 | Passed final passage; yeas, 91; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-09 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-03-08 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-08 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-08 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2010-03-08 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-01 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-03-01 | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-03-01 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-03-01 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-03-01 | Public hearing, executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-26 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-26 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-26 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-17 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-05 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-05 | APPG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-05 | APPG - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-05 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government Appropriations at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-28 | Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government Appropriations at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-19 | First reading, referred to General Government Appropriations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6422 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.