WA HB2918 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Granting a city or town the authority to establish and operate a traffic school without county consent, control, or supervision.
Title
Granting a city or town the authority to establish and operate a traffic school without county consent, control, or supervision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | House | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-04-01 | House | Chapter 201, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | GOS - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security. |
2016-02-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 87; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-02-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-09 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-04 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-04 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-27 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |