WA HB2888 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing workplace bullying by making it an unfair practice to subject an employee to an abusive work environment.
Title
Addressing workplace bullying by making it an unfair practice to subject an employee to an abusive work environment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-02-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-01 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:30 AM. |
2018-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2888&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2888.pdf |