WA HB2887 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Effective date 6/7/2018*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Addressing county commissioner elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Addressing county commissioner elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HouseEffective date 6/7/2018*.
2018-03-28HouseChapter 301, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-28HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-08HouseDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-07SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-03HousePassed final passage; yeas, 81; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2018-03-03HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2018-02-27SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 38; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2018-02-27SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-27SenateFloor amendment
2018-02-26SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-21SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-20SenateMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-20SenateLGOV - Majority; do pass.
2018-02-20SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-10SenateFirst reading, referred to Local Government.
2018-02-08HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 83; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2018-02-08HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-08House1st substitute bill substituted
2018-02-06HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-02HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-01-31HouseSEIT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-31HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-30HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-19HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology

Same As/Similar To

SB6512 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-30 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback