WA HB2864 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a running start summer school pilot program.
Title
Establishing a running start summer school pilot program.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Paul [D] | Rep. Melanie Morgan [D] | Sen. Javier Valdez [D] | Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] |
Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-03 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-04-03 | House | Chapter 348, 2020 Laws. |
2020-04-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2020-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 78; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-13 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-10 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-10 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-03 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-03 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-27 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |