WA HB2811 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying residential landlord-tenant act provisions relating to tenant screening, evictions, and refunds.
Title
Modifying residential landlord-tenant act provisions relating to tenant screening, evictions, and refunds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-26 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-04 | House | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB6413 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-29 - Effective date 6/9/2016.