WA HB2806 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning mediation in family law cases involving children.
Title
Concerning mediation in family law cases involving children.
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-07 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |