WA HB2789 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-12 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-12 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing issuance of subpoenas for purposes of agency investigations of underground economy activity.
Title
Authorizing issuance of subpoenas for purposes of agency investigations of underground economy activity.
Sponsors
Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] | Rep. Jim Moeller [D] |
Rep. Geoffrey Simpson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-12 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-12 | Chapter 22, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-12 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-05 | President signed. | |
2010-03-04 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-02 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-03-02 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-01 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-26 | LCCP - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-25 | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-17 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. | |
2010-02-15 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2010-02-15 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-15 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-13 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-08 | WAYS - Majority; do pass CL 10 bill proposed by Commerce & Labor. | |
2010-02-08 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-08 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. | |
2010-02-03 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-01-29 | CL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-29 | CL - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-29 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-22 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-14 | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |