WA HB2785 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing the list of foster parent rights and responsibilities to prospective and current foster parents.
Title
Providing the list of foster parent rights and responsibilities to prospective and current foster parents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-13 | House | Chapter 51, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | HSC - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
2018-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-02 | House | ELHS - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |