WA HB2782 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning electric-assisted bicycles.
Title
Concerning electric-assisted bicycles.
Sponsors
Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] | Rep. Melanie Stambaugh [R] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Richard Muri [R] |
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-06 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 11:30 AM. |
2018-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB6434 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-13 - Effective date 6/7/2018.