WA HB2782 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Effective date 3/29/2010*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Effective date 3/29/2010*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Reorganizing delivery of services to recipients of public assistance.
Title
Reorganizing delivery of services to recipients of public assistance.
Sponsors
Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] | Rep. Mary Dickerson [D] | Rep. Mark Ericks [D] |
Rep. Tami Green [D] | Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] | Rep. Lynn Kessler [D] | Sen. John McCoy [D] |
Rep. Jim Moeller [D] | Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] | Sen. Sharon Nelson [D] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] |
Rep. Mary Roberts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Effective date 3/29/2010*. | |
2010-03-29 | Chapter 8, 2010 Laws 1st Special Session PV. | |
2010-03-29 | Governor partially vetoed. | |
2010-03-24 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-23 | President signed. | |
2010-03-23 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-22 | Passed final passage; yeas, 57; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-22 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-03-22 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2010-03-22 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-22 | Floor amendment | |
2010-03-20 | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. | |
2010-03-19 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 59; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-03-19 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-19 | Floor amendment | |
2010-03-19 | Returned to second reading for amendment. | |
2010-03-19 | Rules suspended. | |
2010-03-15 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. | |
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Rules. | |
2010-03-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-09 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-03-09 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-03-09 | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-03-08 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 11:00 AM. | |
2010-03-02 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-26 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-26 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-26 | HSC - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-15 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. | |
2010-02-12 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 55; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-12 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-12 | 2nd substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-09 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-09 | WAYS - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-09 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-09 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 3:00 PM. | |
2010-02-06 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-01-28 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-01-28 | HS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-28 | HS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-28 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-21 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-14 | First reading, referred to Human Services. |