WA HB2767 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House Civil Rights & Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House Civil Rights & Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing recreational target shooting areas on public lands.
Title
Establishing recreational target shooting areas on public lands.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] | Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] | Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] |
Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Sen. Chris Gildon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6541 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-22 - First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2767&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2767.pdf |