WA HB2752 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning issuance of search warrants by district and municipal court judges.
Title
Concerning issuance of search warrants by district and municipal court judges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-13 | House | Chapter 50, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2018-01-29 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2018-01-29 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-01-29 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-01-26 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-23 | House | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-18 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |