WA HB2721 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning commute trip reduction programs.
Title
Concerning commute trip reduction programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Rep. Phyllis Kenney [D] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Sharon Nelson [D] |
Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. David Upthegrove [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-03-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-01 | TRAN - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-03-01 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-15 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2010-02-12 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-02-12 | Placed on third reading. | |
2010-02-12 | Committee recommendations adopted and the 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-19 | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-19 | TR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-19 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-18 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-12 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |