WA HB2710 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adding proximity to working forests to the residential real estate disclosure statement.
Title
Adding proximity to working forests to the residential real estate disclosure statement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | FI - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 9:15 AM. |
2018-02-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance. |
2018-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-24 | House | BFS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services |