WA HB2684 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 9/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 9/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Defining the process for best interest determinations of students in out-of-home care.
Title
Defining the process for best interest determinations of students in out-of-home care.
Sponsors
Rep. Michelle Caldier [R] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] | Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] |
Rep. Lillian Ortiz-Self [D] | Rep. Norm Johnson [R] | Rep. Richard Muri [R] | Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Effective date 9/1/2018. |
2018-03-21 | House | Chapter 139, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-21 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2018-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-08 | House | Floor amendment |
2018-02-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-30 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Education |