WA HB2658 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning tribal cultural resources protection in the forest practices act.
Title
Concerning tribal cultural resources protection in the forest practices act.
Sponsors
Rep. Lillian Ortiz-Self [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
Rep. Chris Reykdal [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources. |
2016-02-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-02 | House | CDHT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
SB6362 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.