WA HB2648 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing unemployment insurance penalties and contribution rates for employers who are not "qualified employers."
Title
Addressing unemployment insurance penalties and contribution rates for employers who are not "qualified employers."
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Rep. Tami Green [D] | Rep. Phyllis Kenney [D] | Rep. Jim Moeller [D] |
Rep. Geoffrey Simpson [D] | Sen. Scott White [D] | Rep. Brendan Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-17 | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-13 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-01-21 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-19 | CL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-19 | CL - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-19 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-13 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. | |
2010-01-08 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6524 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - Effective date 6/10/2010*.