WA HB2646 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing work-related musculoskeletal disorders in the health care sector.
Title
Reducing work-related musculoskeletal disorders in the health care sector.
Sponsors
Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Michael Sells [D] |
Rep. Lauren Davis [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Strom Peterson [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-10 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-10 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-30 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-23 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2646&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2646.pdf |