WA HB2638 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 3/25/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 3/25/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing sports wagering subject to the terms of tribal-state gaming compacts.
Title
Authorizing sports wagering subject to the terms of tribal-state gaming compacts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | House | Effective date 3/25/2020. |
2020-03-25 | House | Chapter 127, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-07 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 83; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 34; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2020-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 83; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-13 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-11 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-11 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-11 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Commerce & Gaming. |
2020-02-11 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-30 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-30 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-30 | House | COG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6394 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-07 - On motion, referred to Ways & Means.