WA HB2634 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Vetoed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting a sale or transfer of real property for affordable housing to a nonprofit entity, housing authority, or public corporation from the real estate excise tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempting a sale or transfer of real property for affordable housing to a nonprofit entity, housing authority, or public corporation from the real estate excise tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-03HouseGovernor vetoed.
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-10SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-10SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-10SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-03-10SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-03-09SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-03-09SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2020-03-09SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2020-03-02SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-27SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-02-26SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-02-26SenateHSA - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-19SenateFirst reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability.
2020-02-17HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-02-17HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-17House1st substitute bill substituted
2020-02-16HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-11HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-10HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-10HouseFIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-10HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-07HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-16HouseFirst reading, referred to Finance.

Same As/Similar To

SB6366 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-20 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback