WA HB2621 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Designating resource programs for science, technology, engineering, and mathematics instruction in K-12 schools.
Title
Designating resource programs for science, technology, engineering, and mathematics instruction in K-12 schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Rep. Kathryn Haigh [D] | Rep. Marcie Maxwell [D] | Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] |
Rep. Tina Orwall [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-29 | Chapter 238, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-29 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Passed final passage; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-03-06 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-03-04 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-04 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-04 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-01 | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-03-01 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-03-01 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-27 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. | |
2010-02-25 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-25 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-25 | EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-24 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-16 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. | |
2010-02-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2010-02-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-04 | APPE - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-04 | APPE - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-04 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Education Appropriations at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to Education Appropriations. | |
2010-01-26 | ED - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-01-26 | ED - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-26 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-20 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Education. | |
2010-01-08 | Prefiled for introduction. |