WA HB2616 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning parents with intellectual or developmental disabilities involved in dependency proceedings.
Title
Concerning parents with intellectual or developmental disabilities involved in dependency proceedings.
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Freeman [D] | Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] | Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] | Rep. Mary Roberts [D] |
Rep. Norma Smith [R] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-03-31 | House | Chapter 163, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-13 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-11 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | HSC - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
2014-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-13 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-10 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-10 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-10 | House | APP - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-10 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2014-02-03 | House | ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-03 | House | ELHS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 6:00 PM. |
2014-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |