WA HB2610 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning county commissioner elections.
Title
Concerning county commissioner elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security. |
2016-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 50; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2016-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-12 | House | Floor amendment |
2016-02-09 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-01-28 | House | SG - Majority; do pass. |
2016-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to State Government |
Same As/Similar To
SB6514 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.