WA HB2590 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding the transitional bilingual instruction program.
Title
Regarding the transitional bilingual instruction program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2018-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 63; nays, 34; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-30 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-30 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-29 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Education |