WA HB2575 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that certain teacher assignment and reassignment data be included in data submitted to the office of the superintendent of public instruction.
Title
Requiring that certain teacher assignment and reassignment data be included in data submitted to the office of the superintendent of public instruction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-03-31 | House | Chapter 161, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2014-02-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-03 | House | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-03 | House | ED - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Education |