WA HB2565 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning drug and gene therapy payment for medicaid managed care organizations.
Title
Concerning drug and gene therapy payment for medicaid managed care organizations.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Schmick [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2018-02-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-09 | House | Floor amendment |
2018-02-09 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-02 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |