WA HB2557 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning bone marrow donation information provided to driver's license and identicard applicants.
Title
Concerning bone marrow donation information provided to driver's license and identicard applicants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-02-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2018-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-26 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
Same As/Similar To
SB6155 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-22 - Effective date 7/1/2018.