WA HB2539 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the inheritance exemption for the real estate excise tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the inheritance exemption for the real estate excise tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-01HouseEffective date 6/9/2016.
2016-04-01HouseChapter 174, 2016 Laws.
2016-04-01HouseGovernor signed.
2016-03-07HouseDelivered to Governor.
2016-03-04SenatePresident signed.
2016-03-04HouseSpeaker signed.
2016-03-02SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2016-03-02SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2016-03-01SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2016-02-29SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2016-02-29SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2016-02-29SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:30 PM.
2016-02-23SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2016-02-18SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2016-02-16HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2016-02-16HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2016-02-16House1st substitute bill substituted
2016-02-15HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2016-01-29HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2016-01-26HouseFIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2016-01-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM.
2016-01-22HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2016-01-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Finance

Same As/Similar To

SB6367 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback