WA HB2530 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring free infectious disease testing for good samaritans.
Title
Requiring free infectious disease testing for good samaritans.
Sponsors
Sen. June Robinson [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] | Rep. Roger Freeman [D] |
Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2014-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-03 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-03 | House | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 6:00 PM. |
2014-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
Same As/Similar To
SB6174 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-16 - First reading, referred to Health Care.