WA HB2518 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying oath requirements for interpreters.
Title
Modifying oath requirements for interpreters.
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Troy Kelley [D] | Rep. Jay Rodne [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-24 | Chapter 190, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-24 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-25 | JUD - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-24 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-12 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2010-02-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-10 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-10 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-01-28 | Placed on second reading. | |
2010-01-28 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-21 | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-21 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-21 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-13 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2010-01-04 | Prefiled for introduction. |