WA HB2499 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changing regulations concerning black powder.
Title
Changing regulations concerning black powder.
Sponsors
Sen. Barbara Bailey [R] | Rep. Bruce Chandler [R] | Rep. Joel Kretz [R] | Rep. Daniel Roach [R] |
Rep. Joe Schmick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Rules. | |
2010-03-01 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | LCCP - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-18 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-13 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. | |
2010-02-11 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-11 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-11 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-11 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-02 | CL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-02 | CL - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-02 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-29 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. | |
2010-12-29 | Prefiled for introduction. |