WA HB2496 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-10)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning pro bono legal services for military service members, veterans, and their families.
Title
Concerning pro bono legal services for military service members, veterans, and their families.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Public hearing, executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:30 PM. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2016-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-17 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-08 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-08 | House | GGIT - Majority; do pass JUDI 16 bill proposed by Judiciary. |
2016-02-08 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to General Government & Information Technology. |
2016-02-04 | House | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB6300 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.