WA HB2482 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Effective date 3/26/2024**.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Effective date 3/26/2024**.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Reinstating semiconductor tax incentives.
Title
Reinstating semiconductor tax incentives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade: do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Committee on Finance: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade: do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Committee on Finance: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | House | Effective date 3/26/2024**. |
2024-03-26 | House | Chapter 261, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-26 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 94; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2024-03-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | BFGT - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade. |
2024-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2024-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-12 | House | Floor amendment |
2024-02-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-05 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-26 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6137 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-15 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
82 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 04 | 2404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 04 | 426 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 04 | 448 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 08 | 965 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 08 | 9651 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 08 | 970 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 12 | 965 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 12 | 9651 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 12 | 970 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 32 | 790 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
84 | 36 | 645 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |