WA HB2474 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-7)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the save toward a retirement today retirement savings plan.
Title
Creating the save toward a retirement today retirement savings plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-14 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. |
2014-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 54; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-14 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-11 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-11 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-11 | House | APP - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-11 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 12:00 PM. |
2014-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB6294 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-23 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 1:30 PM.