WA HB2451 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing use of voter approved local excess tax levies to pay financing contracts under the local option capital asset lending program and clarifying which "other agencies" may participate in the program.
Title
Authorizing use of voter approved local excess tax levies to pay financing contracts under the local option capital asset lending program and clarifying which "other agencies" may participate in the program.
Sponsors
Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Rep. Hans Dunshee [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] |
Sen. Scott White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-05 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-03 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-03 | CB - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-03 | CB - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-03 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-19 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. | |
2010-12-09 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6218 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-18 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2451&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2451.pdf |