WA HB2425 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Effective date 7/1/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Effective date 7/1/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning massage therapists.
Title
Concerning massage therapists.
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Rep. Joe Schmick [R] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Rep. Bruce Chandler [R] |
Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Jay Rodne [R] | Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] | Rep. Matt Manweller [R] |
Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Effective date 7/1/2017. |
2016-03-29 | House | Chapter 41, 2016 Laws. |
2016-03-29 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 2; excused, 1. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2016-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on third reading. |
2016-02-17 | House | Committee recommendations adopted and the 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-09 | House | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-01-29 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
Same As/Similar To
SB6181 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.