WA HB2399 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on March 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-12 - Effective date 7/1/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on March 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-12 - Effective date 7/1/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting and prescribing penalties for engaging in, or advertising to engage in, solid waste collection without a solid waste collection certificate.
Title
Prohibiting and prescribing penalties for engaging in, or advertising to engage in, solid waste collection without a solid waste collection certificate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-12 | Effective date 7/1/2010. | |
2010-03-12 | Chapter 24, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-12 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-05 | President signed. | |
2010-03-04 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-27 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2010-02-27 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-22 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-22 | EWE - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-19 | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, and Water & Energy at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-17 | First reading, referred to Environment, Water & Energy. | |
2010-02-15 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-15 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-15 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-15 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-21 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-19 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-01-19 | EPAR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-19 | EPAR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-19 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ecology & Parks at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-15 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ecology & Parks at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Ecology & Parks. | |
2010-12-07 | Prefiled for introduction. |