WA HB2388 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning theatrical wrestling.
Title
Concerning theatrical wrestling.
Sponsors
Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] | Sen. Drew MacEwen [R] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. JD Rossetti [D] |
Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-16 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | CL - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
2016-02-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-15 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-05 | House | GGIT - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 3:30 PM. |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred to General Government & Information Technology. |
2016-01-26 | House | BFS - Majority; do pass. |
2016-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 8:30 AM. |
2016-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services |