WA HB2368 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that at least one member on each community college board of trustees be from labor. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Requiring that the board of trustees for each college district include at least one member from labor. )
Title
Requiring that at least one member on each community college board of trustees be from labor. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Requiring that the board of trustees for each college district include at least one member from labor. )
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-03-08 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2012-02-11 | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. | |
2012-02-09 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 54; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2012-02-09 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-09 | Floor amendment | |
2012-02-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to Rules 2 Review. | |
2012-01-26 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2012-01-26 | HE - Majority; do pass. | |
2012-01-26 | HE - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2012-01-26 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 10:00 AM. | |
2012-01-18 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. | |
2012-01-12 | First reading, referred to Higher Education. |