WA HB2362 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning video and/or sound recordings made by law enforcement or corrections officers.
Title
Concerning video and/or sound recordings made by law enforcement or corrections officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | House | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-04-01 | House | Chapter 163, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 57; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 37; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 5:30 PM. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2016-02-22 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 61; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-02-22 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-22 | House | Floor amendment |
2016-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-01-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-01-20 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass. |
2016-01-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2016-01-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |