WA HB2358 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying marijuana-related definitions.
Title
Clarifying marijuana-related definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2018-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-19 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
2018-01-03 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |