WA HB2335 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 6/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 6/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing health care provider credentialing.
Title
Addressing health care provider credentialing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Effective date 6/1/2018. |
2016-03-31 | House | Chapter 123, 2016 Laws. |
2016-03-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2016-02-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-11 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-01-29 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-01-29 | House | GGIT - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 3:30 PM. |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred to General Government & Information Technology. |
2016-01-15 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-01-15 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-01-15 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-01-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
2016-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6336 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.